RI S0656 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Relieves property owners from implementing lead hazard mitigation for pre-1978 rental dwelling units that are comprised of 2 or 3 units, one of which is occupied by the property owner.
Title
Lead Hazard Mitigation
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-12 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2023-06-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2023) |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2023) |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2023) |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |