RI S0653 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a separate variance process for certain properties that sustain damages as a result of a state emergency or local disaster emergency.
Title
Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0653.pdf |