RI S0637 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends electric distribution companies authority to charge interconnecting renewable energy customers for certain modifications and places timetables on interconnection work.
Title
Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |