RI S0634 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the energy efficiency and resources management council to run a triennial competitive bid process to select an entity to propose and administer system reliability and energy efficiency and conservation procurement until March 1, 2036.
Title
Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | House | House passed Sub B |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2021-06-26 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |