RI S0627 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Task Force To Study Elderly Abuse And Financial Exploitation (extends The Reporting Date Of The Special Task Force To Study Elderly Abuse And Financial Exploitation From February 5, 2019, To June 31, 2019, And Said Commission Expires On December 31, 2019.)
Title
Senate Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Task Force To Study Elderly Abuse And Financial Exploitation (extends The Reporting Date Of The Special Task Force To Study Elderly Abuse And Financial Exploitation From February 5, 2019, To June 31, 2019, And Said Commission Expires On December 31, 2019.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/19/2019) |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0627.pdf |