RI S0618 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-26 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-26 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Budget Commissions: require the state to indemnify and hold harmless any fiscal overseer, budget commission member, receiver, administration, finance officer acting in accordance with chapter 45-9, “An Act Relating to Cities and Towns – Providing for Financial Stability”
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Budget Commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Referred to House Finance | |
2011-05-26 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-05-24 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-17 | Committee heard | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0618.pdf |