RI S0617 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a court may issue orders of support, maintenance and education for certain adult children who are dependent on a parent for support.
Title
Divorce And Separation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2015) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0617.pdf |