RI S0610 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new process with standards to be utilized when deciding whether an applicant's past criminal contacts' convictions should disqualify them from receiving a government issued license.
Title
Licensing
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |