RI S0607 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the long-term air-quality monitoring program at T.F. Green Airport to July 31, 2024.
Title
The Permanent Air Quality Monitoring Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-06-06 | House | Meeting postponed (06/09/2021) |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/11/2021) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2021) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |