RI S0605 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employers from conducting a background check until after a conditional employment offer is made, and prohibit considering convictions.
Title
The Fair Chance Employment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2021) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0605.pdf |