RI S0602 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Select Commission To Determine The Future Of Solid Waste Management In Rhode Island
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Select Commission To Determine The Future Of Solid Waste Management In Rhode Island
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013) |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/23/2013) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2013) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee heard |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2013) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |