RI S0597 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education -- Foundation Level School Support: would provide that debt service that is no longer carried on the books of any regional school district would not be included in that district’s annual regional school district budget
Title
An Act Relating To Education -- Foundation Level School Support
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Referred to House Finance | |
2011-06-28 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-06-27 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-27 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-25 | Committee heard | |
2011-05-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0597.pdf |