RI S0587 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires all candidates to file financial statements within 30 days after filing notice of organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declarations Of Candidacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateSigned by Governor
2019-07-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-27HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-26SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-06-26SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019)
2019-06-26SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-25SenateProposed Substitute
2019-06-24SenateScheduled for consideration (06/26/2019)
2019-03-21SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019)
2019-03-14SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback