RI S0586 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates division of planning from evaluation process of future state prop. leases. Eliminates requirement of notice to local planning board's planning program of hearings and zoning changes.
Title
Relating To Public Property And Works
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |