RI S0583 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lists information needed by recipients of transportation of non-emergency medical appointment services.
Title
Non-emergency Medical Transportation
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/23/2019) |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0583.pdf |