RI S0581 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the executive office of health and human services from entering into manage care organization (MCO) contracts that permit managed care organizations to contract with pharmacy benefit managers (PBM).
Title
Office Of Health And Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0581.pdf |