RI S0579 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the current law so that digital breast tomosynthesis (dbt) screenings are available wherever mammograms are conducted and to provide insurance coverage for such screenings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Breast Cancer Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2019)
2019-03-14SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback