RI S0568 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables cities and towns to provide property tax relief to individuals who take resiliency measures to rehabilitate their property because of flood hazards
Title
Coastal And Riverine Home Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |