RI S0566 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes crimes against the public trust and criminal penalties and civil damages for illegal trust offenses. It would set a 10 year criminal statute of limitations and provide for possible pension revocation or reduction for any job-related felony.
Title
Crime Against The Public Trust
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2015) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0566.pdf |