RI S0548 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restores longevity payments of five percent (5%) of base salary for employees after ten (10) years of service and increase to ten percent (10%) of base salary after twenty (20) years of service, beginning July 1, 2023.
Title
Council On Post Secondary Education
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
Sen. David Tikoian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0548.pdf |