RI S0541 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals -- Developmental Disabilities (would Allow Adult Siblings Of Persons With Developmental Disabilities To Serve As Shared Living Providers In Accordance With The Department Of Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals Rules And Regulations.)
Title
An Act Relating To Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals -- Developmental Disabilities (would Allow Adult Siblings Of Persons With Developmental Disabilities To Serve As Shared Living Providers In Accordance With The Department Of Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals Rules And Regulations.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2013) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0541.pdf |