RI S0539 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the appropriation of a sum that is sufficient to establish to provide direction and proposals to reduce racial disparity in incarceration.
Title
Making An Appropriation To Establish A Commission To Provide Direction And Proposals For Legislation, Metrics, And Progress In Reducing Racial Disparity In Incarceration
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Robert Britto [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
Sen. Victoria Gu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0539.pdf |