RI S0529 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/28/2021)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/28/2021)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Issues permanent registration and registration plates to vehicles owned by the Civil Air Patrol.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/28/2021) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0529.pdf |