RI S0503 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits any individual convicted of domestic violence or subject to a restraining order, from possessing a firearm.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/18/2015) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2015) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0503.pdf |