RI S0502 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it a misdemeanor to possess, transfer and/or produce child erotica for the specific purpose of sexual gratification or sexual arousal, punishable by confinement in jail for not more than one year, or fine of not more than$1,000, or both.
Title
Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2021) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |