RI S0492 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Meeting postponed (04/16/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Meeting postponed (04/16/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires operators of motorcycles and related vehicles to acknowledge on the registration application that operating without a helmet could cause physical injury.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/16/2015) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0492.pdf |