RI S0487 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes one of the eligibility requirements to vote by mail ballot from an elector who "may" not be able to vote at a polling place to and an elector who will not be able to vote at a polling place.
Title
Mail Ballots
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0487.pdf |