RI S0486 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Determine reimbursement rates for medical records copies from health care providers including those that utilize an electronic health records system.
Title
Department Of Health
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Department of health in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-21 | House | House passed Sub B |
2017-06-16 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2017-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Committee voted to reconsider |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2017) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |