RI S0473 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds live-in caregivers and others residing in a dwelling unit to the definition of tenant, and would permit such person to extend the term of a lease for up to three (3) months.
Title
Residential Landlord And Tenant Act
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/23/2019) |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0473.pdf |