RI S0466 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Procedure (would Codify The Standards Necessary For Law Enforcement Personnel To Conduct Strip Searches And Body Cavity Searches.)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Procedure (would Codify The Standards Necessary For Law Enforcement Personnel To Conduct Strip Searches And Body Cavity Searches.)
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2013) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0466.pdf |