RI S0463 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows damages recovery for emotional stress, grief, loss of enjoyment of life resulting from wrongful death of a spouse, parent, child to all pending future claims.
Title
Procedure In Particular Actions - Death By Wrongful Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |