RI S0458 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that an information technology project manager be assigned for all requests for proposals for information technology projects.
Title
Departments Of State Government
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/25/2017) |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |