RI S0455 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses (make It Unlawful For Person To Receive/transport/possess Any Firearm Which Has Had Any Maker/model/manufacturer's Number Or Other Mark Of Identification Removed/altered/obliterated, Except For Antique And Collectible Weapons Etc)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses (make It Unlawful For Person To Receive/transport/possess Any Firearm Which Has Had Any Maker/model/manufacturer's Number Or Other Mark Of Identification Removed/altered/obliterated, Except For Antique And Collectible Weapons Etc)
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |