RI S0443 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Updates the laws relating to physician assistants to reflect current standards and terminology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Assistants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2019)
2019-06-24HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-24HousePlaced on House Calendar
2019-06-21HouseScheduled for consideration (06/24/2019)
2019-06-19HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2019-06-11SenateSenate read and passed
2019-06-05SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019)
2019-06-04SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-31SenateScheduled for consideration (06/04/2019)
2019-04-25SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2019)
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback