RI S0439 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Class B licensees to offer to the public the opportunity to purchase and consume food in conjunction with the sale of alcoholic beverages, at all times while alcohol is consumed on the premises.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] |
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-27 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |