RI S0433 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that municipal insurance corporations would be subject to laws regulating insurance companies and regulated by the Rhode Island department of business regulation.
Title
Relating To Towns And Cities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2017) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/09/2017) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0433.pdf |