RI S0421 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the posting of human trafficking awareness signs at certain state rest and welcome areas as well as at certain businesses.
Title
Trafficking Of Persons And Involuntary Servitude
Sponsors
Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0421.pdf |