RI S0416 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Property -- Mortgage And Foreclosure Sale (would Require A Mortgagee To Participate In Good Faith In A Conciliation Conference Prior To Initiating Foreclosure Proceedings. This Act Would Apply Only To Individual Consumer Mortgages On Any Owner-occupied, One To 4 Unit Residential Property.)
Title
An Act Relating To Property -- Mortgage And Foreclosure Sale (would Require A Mortgagee To Participate In Good Faith In A Conciliation Conference Prior To Initiating Foreclosure Proceedings. This Act Would Apply Only To Individual Consumer Mortgages On Any Owner-occupied, One To 4 Unit Residential Property.)
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-07-02 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/02/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2013) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |