RI S0415 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bans the possession, sale, and transfer of assault weapons. Assault weapons owned on the effective date of this act would be "grandfathered" subject to certain registration provisions.
Title
Assault Weapons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0415.pdf |