RI S0415 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure - Courts (would Require A Sign Language Or Communication Access Realtime Translation (cart) Provider For All Court Proceedings.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure - Courts (would Require A Sign Language Or Communication Access Realtime Translation (cart) Provider For All Court Proceedings.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-11SenateSigned by Governor
2013-07-09SenateTransmitted to Governor
2013-07-03HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2013-07-03HousePlaced on House Calendar (07/03/2013)
2013-07-02SenateSenate passed Sub A
2013-07-02SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (07/02/2013)
2013-07-01SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2013-06-28SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/01/2013)
2013-02-26SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback