RI S0411 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes restrictions on invasive plant species to include running bamboo.
Title
General Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |