RI S0386 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes the state and municipalities from the definition of "owner" for the purposes of liability limitations relating to public use of private lands.
Title
Public Use Of Private Lands--liability Limitations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0386.pdf |