RI S0384 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "chronic intractable pain" for purposes of intractable pain management.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/27/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-05-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2021) |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/30/2021) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |