RI S0376 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Continues all provisions of firefighter's collective bargaining agreements until a successor agreement has been reached or an interest arbitration award has been rendered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighters' Arbitration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseReferred to House Labor
2019-05-01SenateSenate read and passed
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/01/2019)
2019-04-24SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019)
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback