RI S0368 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-15 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-15 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the comprehensive community-police relationship act of 2015 to require an annual study by an outside agency chosen by the department.
Title
Comprehensive Community-- Police Relationship Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2023) |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2023) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |