RI S0361 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminals - Correctional Institutions - Parole (would Provide That If A Person Has Been Convicted Of First Or Second Degree Murder But Has Not Been Sentenced To Life In Prison, Then That Convict Must Serve At Least 50% Of That Sentence Prior To Being Eligible For Parole Consideration.)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminals - Correctional Institutions - Parole (would Provide That If A Person Has Been Convicted Of First Or Second Degree Murder But Has Not Been Sentenced To Life In Prison, Then That Convict Must Serve At Least 50% Of That Sentence Prior To Being Eligible For Parole Consideration.)
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] |
Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/12/2013) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2013) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0361.pdf |