RI S0328 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Respectfully Encouraging The Executive Office Of Health And Human Services (eohhs) To Examine Current Policies And To Make Recommendations On Improving The Quality Of Mental Health Services In Rhode Island
Title
Senate Resolution Respectfully Encouraging The Executive Office Of Health And Human Services (eohhs) To Examine Current Policies And To Make Recommendations On Improving The Quality Of Mental Health Services In Rhode Island
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/27/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2017) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |