RI S0328 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the definition and supervision standards of physician assistants, amends the number and composition of the board of licensure of physician assistants, and more precisely identifies the scope of practice of physician assistants.
Title
Relating To Businesses And Professions
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Marc Cote [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2015) |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2015) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2015) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/12/2015) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |