RI S0326 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes licensed advanced practice registered nurses (APRN), certified in psychiatric/mental health, as qualified to certify the need for mental health treatment in certain patients.
Title
Mental Health Law
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Mark Gee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2017) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0326.pdf |