RI S0319 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows an individual who is eligible to vote and turns eighteen (18) years of age on or before the date of a general election to vote in the primary election immediately preceding that general election.
Title
General Provisions -- Registration Of Voters
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0319.pdf |